MD HB38 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 19 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Delegates Bromwell, Charkoudian, and Wilson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that certain noncompete and conflict of interest provisions that restrict the ability of an employee to enter into employment with a new employer or to become self-employed in the same or similar business or trade are null and void as being against the public policy of the State; providing the Act does not apply to an employment contract or a similar document or agreement with respect to the taking or use of a client list or other proprietary client-related information; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Labor and Employment - Noncompete and Conflict of Interest Clauses

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-19 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-39) (Y: 98 N: 40 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseDelegates Bromwell, Charkoudian, and Wilson
2019-04-03HouseConference Committee Appointed
2019-04-03HouseHouse Requests Senate Recede
2019-04-03HouseHouse Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2019-04-02SenateFloor Amendment {533027/1 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {247176/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Finance
2019-02-20SenateFirst Reading Finance
2019-02-19HouseThird Reading Passed (97-39)
2019-02-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-15HouseFavorable with Amendments Report Adopted
2019-02-14HouseSpecial Order until 02/15 (Delegate Kipke) Adopted
2019-02-14HouseCommittee Amendment Adopted
2019-02-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {553899/1
2019-02-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-16HouseHearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters
2018-11-02HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0038&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0038f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0038t.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0038_55389901.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0038_24717601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0008/hb0038_53302701.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0008/hb0038.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0038_ecm.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0111.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0038_fin.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1011.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback