MD HB384 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources to prepare fishery management plans for the soft-shell clam and razor clam species on or before December 31, 2020, subject to available funding.
Title
Soft-Shell Clams and Razor Clams - Fishery Management Plans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-16 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Clams
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Industry and Technology
Natural Resources
Natural Resources, Department of
Revenue and Taxes
Zoning and Planning