MD HB384 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 189
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of Charles County to adopt an ordinance to prohibit the disposal of a bulky item on a highway or on public or private property except under certain circumstances; and authorizing Charles County to impose penalties of up to 30 days imprisonment or a fine not exceeding $5,000 or both for certain violations.
Title
Charles County - Illegal Disposal of Bulky Items - Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-16 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 189 |
2020-03-17 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2020-03-10 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB429 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 190
Subjects
Charles County
Counties - Generally
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Counties - Generally
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Highways
Laws and Ordinances
Litter
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Refuse Disposal
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |