MD HB386 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-12-22 - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "disabled law enforcement officer or rescue worker" for purposes of certain county or municipal corporation property tax credits to include an individual who became disabled as a result of or in the course of employment as a job series 1811 criminal investigator for a federal government agency; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2021; etc.
Title
Property Tax Credit - Disabled or Fallen Law Enforcement Officers and Rescue Workers - Federal Criminal Investigator
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-10-28 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - Property | 9 | 210 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0386?ys=2021RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2021RS/bills/hb/hb0386f.pdf |