MD HB387 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Expanding a subtraction modification under the Maryland income tax for law enforcement officers to include law enforcement officers who are members of the Maryland Transportation Authority Police and reside in a political subdivision in which the crime rate exceeds the State's crime rate; and applying the Act to all taxable years after December 31, 2018.
Title
Income Tax - Subtraction Modification - Maryland Transportation Authority Police
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 67 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-12 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-08 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-08 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Exemptions
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Residency
Taxes - Income
Transportation, Department of
Exemptions
Income Tax
Law Enforcement
Residency
Taxes - Income
Transportation, Department of