MD HB389 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing in Charles County a resort complex license; authorizing the Board of License Commissioners to issue one resort complex license to a resort complex owner or operator; specifying that the license authorizes the holder to sell beer, wine, and liquor at certain outlets in the resort complex and at certain times; exempting the resort complex license from certain license quotas and restrictions; providing a license fee of $3,500 for two outlet locations and $1,750 for each additional outlet location; etc.
Title
Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Resort Complex License
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 644 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Marinas
Sports and Recreation
Time
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Charles County
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Marinas
Sports and Recreation
Time