MD HB392 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB369
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the State Board of Elections from approving a contract with an election service provider unless the contract requires the provider to report to the State Administrator of Elections if any stage in the manufacturing of a component of the provider's election system occurred outside the United States or if any material change to a component in any stage in the manufacturing of an election system occurred outside the United States; requiring a certain report by the election service provider to the State Administrator; etc.
Title
Election Law – Foreign Manufacture of Election Systems – Notification and Termination of Contract
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-02-21 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments {705761/1 Adopted |
2020-02-21 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB392 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Associations
Ballots
Boundaries
Certifications
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Equipment
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Industry and Technology
International Affairs
internet
Notices
Partnerships
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Voting
Ballots
Boundaries
Certifications
Communications
Contracts
Corporations
Cybersecurity
Data
Disclosure
Elections
Elections, State Board of
Electronic Government
Equipment
Ethics
Examinations
Federal Government
Immigrants and Citizenship
Industry and Technology
International Affairs
internet
Notices
Partnerships
Records
Reports
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Time
Voting
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Election Law | 2 | 110 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |