MD HB393 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a park services associate who is not commissioned as a law enforcement officer to issue a citation for a parking violation on certain property in the State.
Title
Natural Resources - Park Services Associates - Parking Citations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-7) (Y: 38 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-13 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 470 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (38-7) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-11 | Senate | Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Citations
Forests and Parks
Highways
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Parking
Rules and Regulations
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous
Citations
Forests and Parks
Highways
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Parking
Rules and Regulations
Towing
Traffic Regulation
Transportation
Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous