MD HB396 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to provide, by law, for a voluntary installment payment schedule for county, municipal corporation, or special taxing district property tax due on real property; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to authorize, by law, the payment of certain fees or other charges that are also included on a certain property tax bill through a certain installment payment schedule; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019; etc.
Title
Property Tax - Optional Installment Payment Schedule
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 647 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-15 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments {395662/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2019-01-30 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Counties
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Special Tax Districts
Taxes - Property
Escrow Accounts
Fees
Laws and Ordinances
Mortgages
Municipal Corporations
Property Tax
Real Property
Special Tax Districts
Taxes - Property