MD HB398 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB70
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Housing and Community Development to give preference to applications for certain loans that will use the services of certain small, minority, women-owned, and veteran-owned businesses, particularly those businesses that provide employment for individuals trained through workforce development programs, for loans for certain net-zero homes under the Energy-Efficient Homes Construction Loan Program.
Title
Energy Efficiency - Net-Zero Homes - Contract Preferences
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 120 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed (120-16) |
2020-03-09 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-28 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-22 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB398 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Conservation
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Minorities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Economic and Community Development
Energy
Energy Matters
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Minorities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Small Business
Veterans
Women
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 4 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 11 | 708.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |