MD HB40 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-25 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to conduct a comprehensive technical study on geothermal heating and cooling systems; requiring the Administration to submit the results to the Geothermal Energy Workgroup by October 1, 2021; establishing the Workgroup to study the impact of an increase in the use of geothermal energy, examine ways to expand geothermal energy in the State, and study the impact of the industry on jobs; requiring the Administration to develop recommendations for an incentive structure; etc.
Title
Maryland Energy Administration Study on Geothermal Heating and Cooling Systems and Geothermal Energy Workgroup
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-25 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Loans
Pollution
Public Buildings and Facilities
Renewable Energy Sources
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Tax Credits
Time
Utilities
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment
Commerce and Business
Energy
Energy Matters
Environmental Health
Environmental Matters
Examinations
General Assembly
Grants
Heating and Cooling
Loans
Pollution
Public Buildings and Facilities
Renewable Energy Sources
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Sunset
Tax Credits
Time
Utilities
Weights and Measures
Work, Labor, and Employment