MD HB402 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-7)
Status: Passed on May 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-05 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Naturopathic Medicine Advisory Committee within the State Board of Physicians; providing for the composition of the Committee; providing for the terms of a Committee member; specifying the duties of the Committee; requiring the Board to adopt specified regulations; requiring the Board to set specified fees for the issuance and renewal of licenses; requiring the Board to pay the fees to the Comptroller; requiring the Comptroller to distribute the fees of the Board; etc.
Title
Health Occupations - State Board of Physicians - Naturopathic Doctors
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-0) (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-05 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 399 |
2014-04-05 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2014-04-05 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2014-04-05 | House | House Concur - Senate Amendments |
2014-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-04-03 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {304635/1 Report Adopted |
2014-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {526681/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2014-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-24 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Advertising
Appeals
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Expungement
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Hospitals
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Mental Health
Notices
Oaths
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Signs and Billboards
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Vital Records
Advertising
Appeals
Appropriations
Auditors and Audits
Committees and Commissions
Comptroller
Consumer Protection
Contracts
Courts
Crimes and Punishments
Discipline
Disclosure
Discrimination
Diseases
Drugs
Education
Ethics
Examinations
Expungement
Fees
Fines
Fraud
Health
Health Care Facilities
Health Occupations
Hearings
Hospitals
Interstate Affairs
Investigations and Inquiries
Judicial Review
Law Enforcement
Legislative Services, Department of
Liability
Licenses
Medical Malpractice
Mental Health
Notices
Oaths
Patients
Penalties and Sentences
Petitions
Physicians
Privacy
Records
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Sexual Offenses
Signs and Billboards
Subpoenas
Substance Abuse
Sunset
Vital Records