MD HB402 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-15 - Hearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing a court to grant an absolute divorce on the ground of separation of affection if the parties are not engaging in sexual relations under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Family Law - Grounds for Divorce

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-23) (Y: 113 N: 24 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/27 at 12:00 p.m.
2019-03-11SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-08HouseThird Reading Passed (112-23)
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {452319/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback