MD HB406 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB81
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 34-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from leaving a dog outside and unattended for longer than 30 minutes without access to continuous suitable shelter during extreme weather conditions, subject to certain exceptions; making a violation a civil offense; applying certain penalties; and defining the terms "suitable shelter," "sporting," and "extreme weather conditions".
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs in Extreme Weather Conditions
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 125 N: 7 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-15 | House | Third Reading Passed (125-7) |
2020-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {450618/1 Adopted |
2020-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-02-03 | House | Reassigned to Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB406 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Judicial Proceedings
SB627 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
SB627 (Crossfiled) 2020-02-06 - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Criminal Law | 10 | 623 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |