MD HB407 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a District Court Commissioner, in a specified interim protective order, and a judge, in a temporary protective order or final protective order, to award temporary possession of any pet of a person eligible for relief or a respondent.
Title
Domestic Violence - Additional Relief - Award of Temporary Possession of Pet
Sponsors
Del. Susan Aumann [R] | Sen. Jill Carter [D] | Del. Steven DeBoy [D] | Del. Kathleen Dumais [D] |
Del. William Frank [R] | Del. Barbara Frush [D] | Del. Susan McComas [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-23 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 127 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (127-10) | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-24 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Animals
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Domestic Violence
Judges
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Victims
Crimes and Punishments
District Courts
Domestic Violence
Judges
Penalties and Sentences
Protection Orders
Victims