MD HB407 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting Frederick County from specified soil erosion and sediment control standards; requiring completion of specified stabilization measures within specified time periods; eliminating a specified limit on a specified area to be graded; and eliminating a specified mapping requirement.
Title
Environment - Frederick County - Soil Erosion and Sediment Control Standards
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-03-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Environment
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Frederick County
Maps and Charts
Sediment Control
Soil Conservation
Environmental Matters
Erosion
Frederick County
Maps and Charts
Sediment Control
Soil Conservation