MD HB407 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 196
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Transferring the functions, powers, and duties of the Child Support Unit of the Office of the State's Attorney for Harford County to the Child Support Administration of the Department of Human Services; requiring the creation of certain Position Identification Numbers for certain employees; providing for the determination of salary grade and seniority for certain employees; requiring certain employer contributions and interest to be transferred within a certain fund for the Employees' Pension System; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Harford County - State's Attorney's Office and Child Support Administration - Transfer of Personnel

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-18 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 45-0 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-05-08HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 196
2020-03-18HouseReturned Passed
2020-03-18SenateThird Reading Passed 45-0
2020-03-18SenateSecond Reading Passed
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Adopted
2020-03-18SenateFavorable Report by Finance
2020-03-16SenateReferred Finance
2020-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (133-0)
2020-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {624667/1 Adopted
2020-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations
2020-01-31HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2020-01-28HouseReassigned to Appropriations
2020-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Same As/Similar To

SB137 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 197

Subjects


Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
Family Law10117(n/a)See Bill Text

Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback