MD HB408 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-04 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Renaming the Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund to be the Chesapeake Bay and State Waters Trust Fund; modifying the purpose of the Fund to include the restoration and protection of the health of the waters of the State; and expanding the use of the Fund to include certain projects to improve and protect the health of the waters of the State.
Title
Natural Resources - Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays Trust Fund
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Annotated Code of Maryland
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Data
Environment
Environmental Matters
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Publications
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Water
Aquaculture
Chesapeake Bay
Coastal Bays
Conservation
Data
Environment
Environmental Matters
Legislative Services, Department of
Names
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Pollution
Publications
Records
Revenue and Taxes
Taxes - Miscellaneous
Water