MD HB410 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing certain provisions of law authorizing a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to enact certain local laws regulating fences; repealing certain provisions of law prohibiting the enactment of a local law that is not less restrictive than certain local laws; authorizing the legislative body of a municipal corporation in Prince George's County to authorize the erection of a fence that exceeds certain height restrictions or limitations under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Maryland-Washington Regional District - Prince George's County - Municipal Authority PG/MC 108-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 129 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {990813/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-13 | House | Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Bi-County Agencies
Boundaries
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Prince George's County
Signs and Billboards
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Municipal Corporations
Municipalities
Prince George's County
Signs and Billboards
Zoning and Planning