MD HB414 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB825
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Specifying that a certain dispute settlement mechanism does not apply to complaints or demands arising out of a cooperative housing member's failure to pay certain assessments owed to the cooperative housing corporation; repealing a requirement that the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation hold a hearing on a certain alleged violation under certain circumstances; requiring the governing body of a cooperative housing corporation to give certain notice of a member's right to request a hearing on a certain alleged violation; etc.
Title
Cooperative Housing Corporations - Dispute Settlement and Eviction Procedures
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-04 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-01 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-02-26 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments {600612/1 Report Adopted |
2019-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
HB414 (Carry Over) 2019-03-04 - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Subjects
Assessments
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Eviction
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time
Cooperative Associations
Corporations and Associations
Courts
Eviction
Hearings
Housing
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Real Property
Time