MD HB414 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB205
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 30 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Transportation promptly to
undertake all steps necessary to complete the design, engineering, and National Environmental Policy Act process and secure a record of decision for the Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project; requiring the Governor in each of fiscal years 2023 through 2027 to include in the annual State budget an appropriation from the Transportation Trust Fund of at least $5,000,000, contingent on the receipt of certain federal funds for certain purposes related to the Project; etc.
Title
Southern Maryland Rapid Transit Project - Funding
Sponsors
Del. Debra Davis [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-22 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 98 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-30 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 738 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | Senate | Referred Budget and Taxation |
2021-03-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (98-37) |
2021-03-20 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments {134664/1 Adopted |
2021-03-20 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-04 | House | Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Environment and Transportation |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB81 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-30 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
HB205 (Carry Over) 2020-01-22 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
HB205 (Carry Over) 2020-01-22 - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Appropriations) and Hearing canceled (Environment and Transportation)
Subjects
Appropriations
Boundaries
Budgets
Charles County
Construction
Engineers
Environmental Matters
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Railroads
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning
Boundaries
Budgets
Charles County
Construction
Engineers
Environmental Matters
Governor
Investigations and Inquiries
Mass Transit
Prince George's County
Railroads
Revenue and Taxes
Transportation - Generally
Transportation, Department of
Zoning and Planning