MD HB416 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing a certain contingency relating to the adoption of a certain amendment to the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact; entering the State into a certain amendment to the Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact; and providing for the withdrawal of the State from the amendment.
Title
Atlantic States Marine Fisheries Compact - Amendment I - Adoption
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-24 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-24 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2019-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-08 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (140-0) |
2019-03-05 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-05 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-04 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-30 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Fish and Fishing
Hunting and Fishing
Interstate Affairs
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Hunting and Fishing
Interstate Affairs
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials