MD HB417 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 29-6)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 310
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a requirement that a report of a sewer overflow or treatment plant bypass provided to the Department of the Environment by an owner or operator of certain sewer systems or wastewater treatment plants be made by telephone; specifying the content of the procedures that the Department, in cooperation with the Maryland Department of Health, local health departments, and local environmental health directors, is required to develop to provide public notification of a sewer overflow or treatment plant bypasses; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Water Pollution Control – Notification of Sewer Overflows and Treatment Plant Bypasses – Alteration

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (140-0) (Y: 141 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 310
2019-04-04HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-04SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-03SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-03SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14SenateHearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading Passed (140-0)
2019-03-12HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-12HouseFavorable with Amendments {520315/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation
2019-02-05HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Environment and Transportation

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback