MD HB419 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-10 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing an Office of the Inspector General in the Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission; providing for the appointment, qualifications, and term of the inspector general; providing for the establishment and function of an appointment committee; prohibiting the inspector general from participating in a certain merit system; establishing the duties of the inspector general and of the Office; requiring the inspector general to submit certain written reports to the Commission; etc.
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Office of the Inspector General PG/MC 101-18
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-10 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 130 |
2018-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {620213/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-03-14 | House | Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Bi-County Agencies
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fraud
Hearings
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Subpoenas
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment
Attorneys
Auditors and Audits
Bi-County Agencies
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Courts
Electronic Government
Ethics
Fraud
Hearings
Inspections
Investigations and Inquiries
Law Enforcement
Notices
Privacy
Public Information
Public Officials
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Salaries and Compensation
Subpoenas
Washington Suburban Sanitary District
Work, Labor and Employment