MD HB419 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 28 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering references to the term "clean energy" to be "advanced clean energy" for purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the Maryland Clean Energy Center and the Maryland Energy Innovation Institute; altering certain findings of the General Assembly, the purposes of certain provisions of law concerning the development of clean energy industries in the State, and the purposes, powers, and duties of the Center and Institute to include certain actions supporting clean energy innovation; etc.
Title
Economic Development - Advanced Clean Energy and Clean Energy Innovation Investments and Initiatives
Sponsors
Del. Lily Qi [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-10 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 97 N: 40 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 92 N: 39 NV: 5 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-28 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Policy) |
2021-04-10 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-10 | House | Third Reading Passed (97-40) |
2021-04-10 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-2) |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {247878/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2021-03-02 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2021-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed (92-39) |
2021-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {563798/1 Adopted |
2021-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-20 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-08-19 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB460 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-28 - Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fuel
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Wind Energy
Appropriations
Budget and Management, Department of
Budgets
Commerce and Business
Committees and Commissions
Economic and Community Development
Energy Matters
Environment, Department of the
Environmental Health
Equipment
Fuel
General Services, Department of
Industry and Technology
Public Corporations and Instrumentalities
Renewable Energy Sources
Revenue and Taxes
Solar Energy
Wind Energy
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 820 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 821.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 823 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 826 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 828 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 829 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 830 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 834 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 835 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 10 | 839 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Economic Development | 9 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 20B-05 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |