MD HB420 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering a certain prohibition relating to threatening to commit a certain crime of violence in order to prohibit a person from knowingly threatening to commit or threatening to cause to be committed a certain crime of violence that would place five or more people at substantial risk of death or serious physical injury if the threat were carried out.
Title
Criminal Law - Threat of Mass Violence
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 137 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 30 |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2019-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-07 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-06 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Threats
Violence
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Damages
Emergency Bills
Penalties and Sentences
Threats
Violence