MD HB422 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-10 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authorized uses of the Opioid Restitution Fund to include supporting the Office of the Chief Medical Examiner for increased caseloads due to opioid overdose deaths.
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Office of the Chief Medical Examiner
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-10 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations; Withdrawn |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Subjects
Appropriations
Death
Health Occupations
Jurisdiction
Medical Examiners
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Public Health
Records
Reports
Restitution
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Death
Health Occupations
Jurisdiction
Medical Examiners
Medical Treatments
Opioids
Public Health
Records
Reports
Restitution
Substance Abuse
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Finance and Procurement | 7 | 331 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |