MD HB423 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-22 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Requiring each local board of elections to conduct a voter registration drive at least once each school year in each public high school in the county in a manner specified in an agreement between the local board and county board of education; requiring each public official responsible for the use of a public high school to make available to the local board of elections, without charge, the space that is needed in the building for the proper conduct of a voter registration drive; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law – Voter Registration Drive – High Schools

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-11 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (100-39) (Y: 101 N: 40 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-22SenateUnfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-15SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-14HouseThird Reading Passed (100-39)
2019-03-13HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments {985067/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback