MD HB425 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the statute of limitations applicable to certain civil actions relating to unfair, abusive, or deceptive trade practices filed against a mortgage servicer; limiting the application of the Act to claims relating to certain residential property; and providing for the prospective application of the Act.
Title
Civil Actions - Unfair, Abusive, or Deceptive Trade Practices by Mortgage Servicer - Statute of Limitations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (33-13) (Y: 33 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-9) (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-9) (Y: 123 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (33-13) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2019-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-9) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-15 | House | Substitute Committee Amendment {492817/1 Adopted |
2019-03-15 | House | Committee Amendment {462110/1 Withdrawn |
2019-03-15 | House | Motion Reconsider Committee Amendment (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Special Order until next session (Delegate Wivell) Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {462110/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Civil Actions
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Mortgages
Real Property
Statutes of Limitation
Unfair Trade Practices
Civil Actions and Procedures
Consumer Protection
Disclosure
Mortgages
Real Property
Statutes of Limitation
Unfair Trade Practices