MD HB43 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-31 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the uses of the Rural Broadband Assistance Fund; establishing the Office of Broadband in the Department of Information Technology to assist local jurisdictions in improving access to high-speed internet; requiring the Office to coordinate with certain Executive Branch agencies and stakeholders; establishing the Joint Committee on Broadband to ensure that local jurisdictions in the State are able to expand access to high-speed internet and make recommendations for new laws, programs, and services needed to support the expansion; etc.
Title
Department of Information Technology - Office of Broadband and Joint Committee on Broadband
Sponsors
Del. Carol Krimm [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-31 | House | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-12 | House | Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
2020-10-30 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Commerce and Business
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Jurisdiction
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Privatization
Procurement
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Tri-County Council
Commerce, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Counties
Economic and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Information Technology, Department of
Internet Access
Jurisdiction
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Privatization
Procurement
Public Officials
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rural Areas
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Transportation, Department of
Tri-County Council
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Economic Development | 5 | 1102 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 3A | 805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |