MD HB432 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 433
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing that real property owned by a nonprofit museum that is open to the public and does not charge an admission fee is not subject to a certain limitation concerning the exemption of certain charitable or educational properties from the property tax; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after June 30, 2019.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Property Tax - Exemptions - Nonprofit Charitable Museums

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (122-14) (Y: 123 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 433
2019-03-26HouseReturned Passed
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-15SenateHearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Budget and Taxation
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (122-14)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-08HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-07HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-01HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback