MD HB433 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 489
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the eligibility requirements for an individual to be certified by the Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission as a police officer to require an individual to be either a United States citizen or a permanent legal resident of the United States who is an honorably discharged veteran of the United States armed forces and has applied to obtain United States citizenship; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Maryland Police Training and Standards Commission - Police Officer Certification - Eligibility (Freedom to Serve Act)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (109-28) (Y: 109 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (112-24) (Y: 113 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 489
2019-04-06HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-06HouseThird Reading Passed (109-28)
2019-04-06HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {888570/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (112-24)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-14HouseSpecial Order until next session (Delegate Mautz) Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments {202717/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-14HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0433&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0433f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0433t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0433e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_489_hb0433e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0433_20271701.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0003/hb0433_88857001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0003/hb0433.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0433_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0516.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0433_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1050.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1427.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback