MD HB434 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 15 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-10 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Medical Assistance Program, subject to a certain limitation, to provide health care services appropriately delivered through telehealth, including services provided using an audio-only call; altering a certain provision of law requiring the Program to provide certain mental health services to include the use of an audio-only call; providing that certain regulations may not prohibit a health care provider from using audio-only calls to provide certain services; etc.
Title
Public Health – Telehealth – Health Care Practitioners and the Maryland Medical Assistance Program
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-10 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-03 | House | Hearing canceled |
2021-01-21 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Communications
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Virtual Environments
Health
Health Occupations
Medical Assistance
Mental and Behavioral Health
Public Health
Substance Abuse
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Telephones
Video
Virtual Environments
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Health - General | 15 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 1001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health Occupations | 1 | 1006 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |