MD HB438 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Repealing a Class GC (golf course) license in Charles County and establishing a Class GC (golf course) privilege; specifying that an owner or operator of a public or private golf course has a golf course privilege to sell alcoholic beverages on the golf course if the owner or operator holds a certain class of license and pays a $200 annual fee; and specifying that the privilege expands the licensed premises to include the golf course.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - Golf Course Privilege

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 135 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 653
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (134-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-15HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-31HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-31HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback