MD HB443 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a Southern Maryland code county to enact a local law that provides regular employees of the county with certain collective bargaining rights; requiring a certain local law to provide definitions of and remedies for unfair labor practices and prohibit certain strikes or work stoppages by certain employees; providing that "regular employee" does not include an appointed or elected official, or a supervisory, managerial, or confidential employee; etc.
Title
Southern Maryland Code Counties - Collective Bargaining
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-03-14 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 117 N: 12 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 209 |
2020-03-18 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2020-03-14 | House | Third Reading Passed (117-12) |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB430 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 210
Subjects
Calvert County
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Public Employees
St. Mary's County
Strikes
Work, Labor and Employment
Charles County
Collective Bargaining
Counties
Counties - Local Laws
Laws and Ordinances
Public Employees
St. Mary's County
Strikes
Work, Labor and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Local Government | 11 | 601 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |