MD HB444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-03-22 - Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that a citizen who has not lived in the United States but has a parent who is a resident of the State is a resident of the State for purposes of voter registration; prohibiting an individual from being considered a resident of the State if the individual has established a domicile outside the State; and authorizing an individual to register to vote and vote only in elections for federal office in the county in the State where a parent resides if the individual meets specified requirements.
Title
Election Law - Citizens Who Have Not Lived in the United States - Right to Vote
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-22 | Hearing 4/1 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-19 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-18 | Third Reading Passed (102-35) | |
2010-03-16 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-16 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-15 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Ways and Means |