MD HB444 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-14 - Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the authorized uses of the HealthChoice Performance Incentive Fund to include financial incentives designed to promote participation in a healthy lifestyle program by Maryland Medical Assistance Program managed care organization enrollees; authorizing an individual who meets specified requirements to claim a credit against the State income tax for participation in a healthy lifestyle program; establishing a credit of $500 for specified individuals; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017; etc.
Title
Public Health - Participation in Healthy Lifestyle Programs - Incentives and Tax Credits
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-14 | House | Unfavorable Report by Health and Government Operations; Withdrawn |
2017-02-10 | House | Hearing canceled (Health and Government Operations) |
2017-02-10 | House | Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2017-01-26 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations and Ways and Means |
Subjects
Health
Income Tax
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment
Income Tax
Managed Care Organizations
Medical Assistance
Public Health
Revenue and Taxes
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor and Employment