MD HB444 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring that a person commence a judicial proceeding to contest the validity of a trust that was revocable at the death of the settlor within a certain period; and applying the Act prospectively.
Title
Estates and Trusts - Contesting Validity of Revocable Trust - Limitation
Sponsors
Sen. Chris West [R] | Sen. Ariana Kelly [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-02 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-05 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2018-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2018-02-28 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-28 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-27 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2018-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |