MD HB447 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing a basket of cheer permit in Frederick County; requiring the Board of License Commissioners to grant the permit at no cost to holders of certain Class C per diem licenses; providing that the permit authorizes the permit holder to provide as a prize at a benefit performance not more than 10 baskets of cheer of alcoholic beverages produced in Maryland and obtained from the holder of a retail license; and stating that the alcoholic beverages in a basket of cheer shall be for off-premises consumption.
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Basket of Cheer
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-31 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-25 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 655 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2019-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2019-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2019-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-03-13 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2019-01-31 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Raffles
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Awards, Medals and Prizes
Frederick County
License Commissioners, Boards of
Raffles