MD HB451 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 18 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-04 - Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m.
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring certain local jurisdictions to adopt provisions for the remote visual inspection of certain residential rental property under certain circumstances; requiring a certain local provision to be calculated to achieve a remote visual inspection that is comparable to an on-site visual inspection, require inspections to be directed by a certain individual, require a certain verification, identify the aspects of a property that may be inspected remotely, and require, before any enforcement action, a certain on-site inspection; etc.
Title
Real Property – Residential Rental Property Inspection – Remote Visual Inspection
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 122 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-04 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 12:30 p.m. |
2021-02-19 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2021-02-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (122-10) |
2021-02-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {470018/1 Adopted |
2021-02-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Boundaries
Codes
Communications
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Real Property
Records
Residential Property
Safety
Video
Codes
Communications
Electronic Surveillance
Emergencies
Equipment
Health
Industry and Technology
Inspections
Jurisdiction
Landlord and Tenant
Leases and Rent
Local Government - Generally
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Privacy
Real Property
Records
Residential Property
Safety
Video
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 8 | 119 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |