MD HB452 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an insurer, nonprofit health service plan, or health maintenance organization that provides coverage for hearing aids to an insured or enrolled individual who is not a minor child and that places a dollar limit on the hearing aid benefit to allow the individual to choose a hearing aid that is priced higher than the benefit payable under the policy or contract and pay the difference between the price of the hearing aid and the dollar limit on the benefit; etc.
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of Hearing Aids
Sponsors
Del. Bonnie Cullison [D] | Del. Nicholaus Kipke [R] | Del. Patrick McDonough [R] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] |
Del. Peter Murphy [D] | Sen. Shirley Nathan-Pulliam [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2011-03-04 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-03-31 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2011-03-30 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-30 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-01 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2011-03-16 | Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-07 | First Reading Finance | |
2011-03-31 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-04 | Third Reading Passed (138-1) | |
2011-03-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-01 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-04 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |