MD HB452 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-16 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing and empowering the County Commissioners of Garrett County, from time to time, to borrow not more than $15,000,000 in order to assist in the financing of the cost of hospital improvements at Garrett County Memorial Hospital; etc.
Title
Garrett County - Bonds for Garrett County Memorial Hospital
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-02-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (134-0) (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-16 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2013-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:15 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 2:00 p.m. |
2013-03-11 | Senate | Hearing cancelled |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-22 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2013-02-21 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2013-02-19 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2013-02-19 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-02-18 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2013-02-12 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | First Reading Appropriations |