MD HB452 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 42-1-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-11 - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the calculation of the Maryland earned income tax credit to increase the amount of credit that specified individuals without qualifying children may claim; expanding eligibility of the credit to allow specified individuals without specified qualifying children to claim the credit; allowing specified individuals 21 years of age and older to claim the credit; applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2016; etc.
Title
Earned Income Tax Credit - Expansion
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-03 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (38-8) (Y: 38 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Raskin) {333128/1 Rejected (10-35) (Y: 10 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Rosapepe) {903223/1 Rejected (7-37) (Y: 7 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Raskin) {333128/1 Rejected (10-35) (Y: 10 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-04-01 - Senate - Senate Floor - Floor Amendment (Rosapepe) {903223/1 Rejected (7-37) (Y: 7 N: 37 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2016-03-17 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (131-3) (Y: 131 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-11 | Senate | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (38-8) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Raskin) {333128/1 Rejected (10-35) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Floor Amendment (Senator Rosapepe) {903223/1 Rejected (7-37) |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {679437/1 Report Adopted |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-03-21 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2016-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (131-3) |
2016-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {945267/1 Report Adopted |
2016-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2016-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-01-29 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |