MD HB452 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-24 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing provisions of law relating to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact; repealing the State's agreement to enter into the compact; repealing the statutory provisions reciting the compact; repealing provisions relating to the appointment, terms, and removal of members of the Maryland delegation to the Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact Commission; repealing the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture to obtain certain information in a certain manner to be used by certain persons; etc.
Title
Northeast Interstate Dairy Compact - Repeal
Sponsors
Del. Alfred Carr [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 46 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-24 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 291 |
2018-04-03 | House | Returned Passed |
2018-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-03-30 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-23 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-02-22 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-0) |
2018-02-20 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2018-02-20 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2018-02-19 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2018-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-25 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S.
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Milk Products
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations
Agriculture, Department of
Committees and Commissions
Congress, U.S.
Governor
Interstate Affairs
Legislative Services, Department of
Milk Products
Notices
Penalties and Sentences
Rules and Regulations