MD HB453 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB986
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Limiting a certain tackle football season to the months of August through December; prohibiting a county board of education or school from offering, approving, or sponsoring tackle football games during the months of January through July; prohibiting a youth sports program from providing tackle football games to youth athletes during the months of January through July; etc.
Title
Education - Public Schools and Youth Sports Programs - Tackle Football
Sponsors
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-10 | Senate | Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-28 | House | Favorable Report by Ways and Means |
2020-02-04 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-23 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Same As/Similar To
HB453 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Age
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Students
Time
Youth
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Sports and Recreation
Students
Time
Youth
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 7 | 433.1 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Health - General | 14 | 502 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |