MD HB460 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1082
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Maryland Higher Education Commission to establish certain procedures that require a public institution of higher education that denies the transfer of a credit or course to an enrolled student to report the denial to the student and the institution from which the student originates and submit to the Commission a report each year listing the denials and the reasons for the denials; and requiring the procedures to direct a certain institution to review a denial of the transfer of a credit or course.
Title
Transfer With Success Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 188 |
2021-04-12 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-09 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-26 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2021-02-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {344869/1 Adopted |
2021-02-22 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
HB1082 (Carry Over) 2020-03-16 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB886 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189
SB886 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 189