MD HB465 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 268
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the distribution of revenue from certain recordation taxes and local transfer taxes collected by the State Department of Assessments and Taxation so the recordation tax collected, after deducting certain revenues, is to be distributed to the county in which the property is located.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

State Department of Assessments and Taxation - Distribution of Recordation and Transfer Tax Revenues

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 139 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-30HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 268
2019-04-05HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-05SenateThird Reading Passed (46-0)
2019-04-04SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-04SenateFavorable Report by Budget and Taxation
2019-03-27SenateHearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-26SenateRereferred to Budget and Taxation
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Senate Rules
2019-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-03-14HouseSecond Reading Passed
2019-03-14HouseFavorable Report Adopted
2019-03-11HouseFavorable Report by Ways and Means
2019-02-06HouseHearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-02-01HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback