MD HB467 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-05 - Referred Rules
Pending: Senate Rules Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the renewable energy portfolio standard for certain years; extending indefinitely the renewable energy portfolio standard percentage derived from Tier 2 renewable sources; repealing the limit on the period of time during which energy from a Tier 2 renewable source is eligible for inclusion in meeting the renewable energy portfolio standard; altering the compliance fee for a shortfall from the required percentage of energy from certain Tier 1 renewable sources for the renewable energy portfolio standard; etc.
Title
Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard - Alterations and Compliance Fees
Sponsors
Del. Mike Rogers [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-02 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 95 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-05 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2021-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-37) |
2021-04-02 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments {923196/1 Adopted |
2021-04-02 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/04 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB316 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-17 - Motion Recommit to Committee (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Subjects
Energy
Energy Matters
Equipment
Power Plants
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Energy Matters
Equipment
Power Plants
Public Service Commission
Renewable Energy Sources
Time
Utilities
Water
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Public Utilities | 7 | 701 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 703 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 704 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Public Utilities | 7 | 705 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |