MD HB469 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 28 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-18 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring a political subdivision to require inspections of specified multifamily dwellings with balconies at least every 10 years, beginning no later than 10 years after the balcony is constructed, to ensure that each balcony meets requirements of the local housing code or the Minimum Livability Code; authorizing a political subdivision to conduct inspections, authorize a third party to conduct the inspections, or require a professional inspector to conduct and certify the inspections in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Balcony Inspections (Jonathan's Law)
Sponsors
Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-18 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn |
2013-02-28 | House | Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-02-07 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-28 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Apartments
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Fees
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Safety
Building Codes
Codes
Counties
Fees
Grants
Hotels and Motels
Housing
Inspections
Local Government Mandates
Public Safety
Safety