MD HB469 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the scope of persons who may apply to begin construction of a new overhead transmission line for electricity under specified circumstances to include an electric company or a person who is or will be subject to regulation as a public utility by an officer or an agency of the United States; prohibiting the Public Service Commission from issuing a certificate of public convenience and necessity for the construction of a specified overhead transmission line to an applicant other than an electric company under specified circumstances; etc.
Title
Public Utilities - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-30 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-07 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2015-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {853197/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-09 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Condemnation
Construction
High Voltage Lines
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Construction
High Voltage Lines
Public Service Commission
Rules and Regulations
Safety
Utilities
Utility Regulation